74. SS-Standarte Ostsee
- Details
- Published: 30 January 2012 30 January 2012
- Last Updated: 07 April 2012 07 April 2012
Commanders
SS-Obersturmführer Wilhelm Biermann (5 Jan 1934 - 8 Mar 1934)SS-Hauptsturmführer Wilhelm Bittrich (8 Mar 1934 - 25 Aug 1934)
SS-Obersturmbannführer Heinz Mozek (25 Aug 1934 - 28 Feb 1935)
SS-Sturmbannführer Otto Müller (1 Mar 1935 - 1 Jan 1942)
SS-Sturmbannführer Fritz Festerling (1 Jan 1942 - ? May 1945)