60. SS-Standarte
- Details
- Published: 29 January 2012 29 January 2012
- Last Updated: 07 April 2012 07 April 2012
Commanders
SS-Standartenführer Heinrich Krause (3 Sep 1933 - 7 May 1934)SS-Obersturmbannführer Dr Eugen Mohr (7 May 1934 - 22 Oct 1934)
SS-Standartenführer Josef Makosch (22 Oct 1934 - ? June 1935)
SS-Standartenführer Maximilian Brand (17 Aug 1935 - 30 June 1936)
SS-Sturmbannführer Werner Fromm (21 Mar 1943 - ? May 1945)