39. SS-Standarte Ostpommern
- Details
- Published: 28 January 2012 28 January 2012
- Last Updated: 07 April 2012 07 April 2012
Commanders
Hauptmann a.D. Willy Krieger (15 Dec 1930 - 7 Oct 1932)SS-Standartenführer Willy Fruggel (7 Oct 1932 - 7 May 1934)
SS-Sturmhauptführer Elimar Schultze (7 May 1934 - 1 Oct 1934)
SS-Obersturmbannführer Otto Kumm (1 Oct 1934 - 31 Oct 1934)
SS-Sturmbannführer Hans Thumser (1 Nov 1935 - 1 Jan 1939)
SS-Standartenführer Norbert Scharfe (1 Jan 1939 - ? May 1945)