SS-Oberabschnitt Warthe
- Details
- Published: 03 February 2012 03 February 2012
- Last Updated: 07 April 2012 07 April 2012
by John Mulholland
HQ - Posen
Oberabschnitt Commanders
SS-Gruppenführer Wilhelm Koppe - 26 Oct 1939 to 9 Nov 1943.SS-Obergruppenführer Theodor Berkelmann - 9 Nov 1943 to 27 Dec 1943.
SS-Brigadeführer Heinz Reinefarth - 29 Dec 1943 to 30 Dec 1944.
SS-Oberführer Friedrich Gehrhardt (*) - 1944 to 30 Dec 1944.
SS-Gruppenführer Willy Schmelcher - 30 Dec 1944 to May 1945.
* (Gehrhardt was substitute for Reinefarth. who held the titular command.)
Abschnitte-SS
SS-Abschnitt (43) - XXXXIII HQ- Lodsch and Litzmannstadt
Commanders:
SS-Brigadeführer Johannes Schäfer - 1 May 1940 to 1 Oct 1940.
SS-Brigadeführer Richard Fiedler - 1 Oct 1940 to 1 Aug 1944.
SS-Oberführer Johann von Feil (*) - 27 Aug 1942 to 1 Oct 1943.
SS-Oberführer Hans Ring - 1 Aug 1944 to May 1945.
* (Von Feil was substitute for Fiedler who held titular command.)
SS-Fußstandarten
109.SS-Standarte Posen110.SS-Standarte Hohensalza
111.SS-Standarte Kolmar
112.SS-Standarte Litzmannstadt
113.SS-Standarte Kalisch
114.SS-Standarte Leßlau