343. Infanterie-Division
- Details
- Published: 04 August 2011 04 August 2011
- Last Updated: 09 August 2013 09 August 2013
The 343. Infanterie-Division was formed in October 1942 at Truppenübungsplatz Grafenwöhr. It was destroyed at Brest in September 1944 and formally disbanded in October.
Commanders
Generalleutnant Friedrich Zickwolff (28 Sep 1942 - 25 Aug 1943) (WIA) (1)
Generalmajor Hermann Kruse (25 Aug 1943 - 1 Feb 1944)
Generalleutnant Erwin Rauch (1 Feb 1944 - 18 Sep 1944)
Area of operations
Germany (Sep 1942 - Nov 1942)
France (Nov 1942 - Sep 1944)
Order of battle
Festungs-Grenadier-Regiment 851
Festungs-Grenadier-Regiment 852
Festungs-Grenadier-Regiment 898 (2)
Artillerie-Regiment 343
Pionier-Bataillon 343
Nachrichten-Abteilung 343
Versorgungseinheiten 343
Footnotes
1. Generalleutnant Friedrich Zickwolff was severly wounded 25 August 1943 in an attack by French partisans in Britanny, he died a month later.
2. Transferred from the 266. Infanterie-Division to the 343. Infanterie-Division on 19 July 1943.
Sources used
Georg Tessin - Verbände und Truppen der deutschen Wehrmacht 1933-1945
Reference material on this unit
- None known at this time -